NY A07272 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to voting, election and referendum procedures; requirements regarding mutual housing companies considering dissolution and/or reconstitution; duties of a board of directors of a limited-profit housing company; prohibits certain limited-profit housing companies from voluntarily dissolving during the state disaster emergency declared in response to the outbreak of COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to voting, election and referendum procedures; requirements regarding mutual housing companies considering dissolution and/or reconstitution; duties of a board of directors of a limited-profit housing company; prohibits certain limited-profit housing companies from voluntarily dissolving during the state disaster emergency declared in response to the outbreak of COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-07Senate3RD READING CAL.1092
2021-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6412
2021-06-02SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-06-02Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-06-02Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-01Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.232
2021-06-01Assemblyrules report cal.232
2021-06-01Assemblyreported
2021-05-24Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-04-29Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S06412 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7272

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback