NY A07258 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - substituted by s4041a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - substituted by s4041a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces certain instances of the words handicapping conditions with disabilities in relation to children with such disabilities.
Title
Replaces certain instances of the words handicapping conditions with disabilities in relation to children with such disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s4041a |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.548 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | print number 7258a |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04041 (Same As) 2023-09-14 - SIGNED CHAP.371