NY A07242 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - print number 7242b
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows for no fault separation where the relationship between the spouses has broken down irretrievably for a period of at least six months; requires that issues of support and custody or visitation have been resolved.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows for no fault separation where the relationship between the spouses has broken down irretrievably for a period of at least six months; requires that issues of support and custody or visitation have been resolved.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-16Assemblyprint number 7242b
2024-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2024-02-22Assemblyprint number 7242a
2024-02-22Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2023-05-15Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S08705 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback