NY A07217 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - substituted by s4677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - substituted by s4677
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the Wallkill river to the definition of inland waterways.
Title
Adds the Wallkill river to the definition of inland waterways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4677 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.482 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-04-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04677 (Same As) 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.348