NY A07214 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To give phone customers the ability to prohibit the use of their phone for the receiving of messages they may find obscene.
Title
Provides that all regulated local exchange telephone companies shall offer customers the option to block access to obscene information-access services and inform their customers of such blocking service; such service shall be without charge to the customer; requires public service commission to instruct such telephone companies to designate a specific prefix for messages the telephone company considers extreme.
Sponsors
Asm. Daniel Burling [R] | Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Brian Kolb [R] |
Asm. William Magee [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions | |
2010-05-14 | reference changed to corporations, authorities and commissions | |
2010-01-06 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | |
2009-03-26 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |