NY A07202 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.446
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.446
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the breastfeeding mothers' bill of rights.
Title
Updates the breastfeeding mothers' bill of rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.446 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5183 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7202a |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.387 |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05183 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7202A