NY A07193 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits non-compete agreements and certain restrictive covenants which unreasonably and unfairly bar or inhibit post-employment competition and protects certain workers from inappropriate and unnecessary restrictions on future employment.
Title
Prohibits non-compete agreements and certain restrictive covenants which unreasonably and unfairly bar or inhibit post-employment competition and protects certain workers from inappropriate and unnecessary restrictions on future employment.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Michele Titus [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.260 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.309 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05790 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR