NY A07181 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - signed chap.329
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - signed chap.329
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York state teachers' retirement system to accept alternate methods of postal mail for submittal of forms and applications.
Title
Authorizes the New York state teachers' retirement system to accept alternate methods of postal mail for submittal of forms and applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Assembly | signed chap.329 |
2021-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1156 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6513 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.337 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06513 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7181