NY A07163 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the crime of resisting arrest; provides that a second violation within 5 years shall be a class E felony.
Title
Relates to the crime of resisting arrest; provides that a second violation within 5 years shall be a class E felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7163a |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |