NY A07162 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.429
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.429
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation aims to allow a grace period for the filing of personal income tax returns and personal income tax when a spouse dies suddenly and without warning within 30 days of the filing deadline
Title
Grants an automatic extension of time for filing a personal income tax return and paying a personal income tax when a spouse dies within 30 days of the April 15th deadline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | signed chap.429 | |
2010-08-18 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-17 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-17 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-14 | 3RD READING CAL.813 | |
2010-06-14 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5789A | |
2010-03-18 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2010-03-18 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-18 | passed assembly | |
2010-03-09 | amended on third reading 7162b | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.478 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-05-26 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2009-05-26 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-26 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-21 | advanced to third reading cal.627 | |
2009-05-19 | reported | |
2009-05-08 | print number 7162a | |
2009-05-08 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-03-25 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S5789-A (Same As) 2010-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7162B