NY A07125 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5719
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the time needed by small businesses and local governments to comply with new regulations.
Title
Relates to the time needed by small businesses and local governments to comply with new regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5719 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.443 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05719 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.231