NY A07094 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to suspension or demotion upon abolition or reduction of positions for labor class titles; provides that incumbents in titles in the labor class that have taken the exam and been promoted to the position of a permanent incumbent, who is suspended or displaced upon abolition or reduction in positions, shall displace incumbents serving in the next lower occupied title in the labor class.
Title
Relates to suspension or demotion upon abolition or reduction of positions for labor class titles; provides that incumbents in titles in the labor class that have taken the exam and been promoted to the position of a permanent incumbent, who is suspended or displaced upon abolition or reduction in positions, shall displace incumbents serving in the next lower occupied title in the labor class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.784 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | committed to governmental employees |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.270 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.442 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S00303 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS