NY A07080 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates uniformed officers of the fire marshal's office of the town of Huntington as peace officers.
Title
Designates uniformed officers of the fire marshal's office of the town of Huntington as peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.491 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1050 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4545 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.337 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.680 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.680 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04545 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7080