NY A07078 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - signed chap.489
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - signed chap.489
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires nail salon owners and operators of appearance enhancement businesses to make available upon request protective masks and gloves to their employees. It also gives employees the right to wear such protection it they so choose,
Title
Requires appearance enhancement business owners to provide masks and gloves to nail specialists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 20 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 20 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-17 | signed chap.489 | |
2010-09-07 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-24 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-24 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-24 | 3RD READING CAL.1201 | |
2010-06-24 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8096 | |
2010-06-23 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-23 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-23 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-23 | ordered to third reading rules cal.287 | |
2010-06-23 | rules report cal.287 | |
2010-06-23 | reported | |
2010-06-21 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-15 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-06-02 | print number 7078a | |
2010-06-02 | amend and recommit to economic development | |
2010-01-06 | referred to economic development | |
2009-03-19 | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08096 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7078A