NY A07062 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of school districts which have the power to contract indebtedness; excludes from such definition school districts in a city with a population exceeding 125,000 inhabitants.
Title
Relates to the definition of school districts which have the power to contract indebtedness; excludes from such definition school districts in a city with a population exceeding 125,000 inhabitants.
Sponsors
Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.182 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.689 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7062 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.941 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5425 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.689 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05425 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.182