NY A07045 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s5959
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s5959
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes mandatory quarterly meetings of the canal recreationway commission not subject to the call of the chairperson.
Title
Makes mandatory quarterly meetings of the canal recreationway commission not subject to the call of the chairperson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s5959 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.222 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05959 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - SIGNED CHAP.671