NY A07024 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits coupled entries on any horse trained or ridden by a jockey's immediate family member with any horse ridden by such jockey.
Title
Prohibits coupled entries on any horse trained or ridden by a jockey's immediate family member with any horse ridden by such jockey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Assembly | tabled |
2021-10-25 | Assembly | vetoed memo.49 |
2021-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1260 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6390 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.276 |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S06390 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7024