NY A07013 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the takeover and restructuring of struggling and persistently struggling schools.
Title
Relates to the takeover and restructuring of struggling and persistently struggling schools.
Sponsors
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D] | Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Senate | tabled |
2015-12-11 | Senate | vetoed memo.283 |
2015-11-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4921 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.273 |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04921 (Same As) 2015-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7013