NY A07002 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to access to viable agricultural land for new and beginning farmers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to access to viable agricultural land for new and beginning farmers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-17Senatetabled
2014-12-17Senatevetoed memo.537
2014-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.949
2014-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5377A
2014-02-11SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
2014-02-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-02-11Assemblypassed assembly
2014-01-22Assemblyamended on third reading 7002b
2014-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.331
2014-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2013-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2013-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2013-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2013-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.244
2013-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.244
2013-06-12Assemblyreported
2013-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2013-06-04Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2013-05-20Assemblyprint number 7002a
2013-05-20Assemblyamend and recommit to agriculture
2013-04-29Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S05377 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7002B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback