NY A06994 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - substituted by s4725a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - substituted by s4725a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Gobind Marg Charitable Society, Incorporated to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.
Title
Permits the Gobind Marg Charitable Society, Incorporated to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Ra [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s4725a |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.371 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.371 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | print number 6994a |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04725 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.310