NY A06974 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-06 - print number 6974a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-06 - print number 6974a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain state police vehicles to carry jumper cables; requires officers operating such vehicles offer to use such jumper cables on disabled vehicles.
Title
Requires certain state police vehicles to carry jumper cables; requires officers operating such vehicles offer to use such jumper cables on disabled vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Assembly | print number 6974a |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02195 (Same As) 2024-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 2195A