NY A06968 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - print number 6968b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - print number 6968b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of the regional state park police to the division of state police; and repeals certain provisions related thereto.
Title
Provides for the transfer of the regional state park police to the division of state police; and repeals certain provisions related thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | print number 6968b |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | print number 6968a |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05267 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5267A