NY A06948 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - advanced to third reading cal.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-01 - advanced to third reading cal.477
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the imposition of New York city water and sewer rents on non-profit institutions.
Title
Relates to the imposition of New York city water and sewer rents on non-profit institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.477 |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to cities |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.260 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.732 |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.732 |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | print number 6948a |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S04263 (Same As) 0000-00-00 -