NY A06945 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an addiction recovery supportive transportation services demonstration program to provide such transportation services to individuals while such individual is receiving treatment, including, but not limited to, inpatient, residential or outpatient treatment.
Title
Establishes an addiction recovery supportive transportation services demonstration program to provide such transportation services to individuals while such individual is receiving treatment, including, but not limited to, inpatient, residential or outpatient treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.192 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.192 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 6945a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S01417 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - PRINT NUMBER 1417A