NY A06919 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the reinstatement of state recognition and acknowledgement of the Montaukett Indian Nation; provides that the Montaukett Indian nation shall have a chief or sachem, three tribal trustees and a tribal secretary; provides for the qualification of voters; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides for the reinstatement of state recognition and acknowledgement of the Montaukett Indian Nation; provides that the Montaukett Indian nation shall have a chief or sachem, three tribal trustees and a tribal secretary; provides for the qualification of voters; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Assembly | tabled |
2023-11-17 | Assembly | vetoed memo.61 |
2023-11-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.973 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6721 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.276 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.276 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06721 (Same As) 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6919