NY A06913 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person who will be 18 years old at the time of a presidential election to vote in the presidential primary election if he or she is 17 years of age at the time of the presidential primary election.
Title
Allows a person who will be 18 years old at the time of a presidential election to vote in the presidential primary election if he or she is 17 years of age at the time of the presidential primary election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | referred to election law |