NY A06906 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to changing the definition of elevated blood lead levels from a blood lead level greater than or equal to ten micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood to five micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood.
Title
Relates to changing the definition of elevated blood lead levels from a blood lead level greater than or equal to ten micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood to five micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.480 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.337 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.337 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06472 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE