NY A06881 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - print number 6881c
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - print number 6881c
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "hunger-free campus act" to address food insecurity among students at public and private higher education institutions.
Title
Establishes the "hunger-free campus act" to address food insecurity among students at public and private higher education institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | print number 6881c |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | print number 6881b |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | print number 6881a |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01151 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to higher education