NY A06875 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Suffolk Islamic Center, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Suffolk Islamic Center, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-25Senatesigned chap.261
2015-09-15Assemblydelivered to governor
2015-06-17SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2015-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2015-06-17SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5689
2015-06-16SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2015-06-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2015-06-16Assemblypassed assembly
2015-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.369
2015-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.369
2015-06-15Assemblyreported
2015-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2015-06-10Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2015-05-05Assemblyprint number 6875b
2015-05-05Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2015-04-27Assemblyprint number 6875a
2015-04-27Assemblyamend and recommit to real property taxation
2015-04-08Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S05689 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6875B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback