NY A06868 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eligible investments in foreign equity securities by public retirement systems of the state.
Title
Relates to eligible investments in foreign equity securities by public retirement systems of the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2015-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.234 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4005 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.501 |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | print number 6868a |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04005 (Same As) 2015-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6868A