NY A06857 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - signed chap.299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - signed chap.299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, from December 31, 2023 to December 31, 2024, the expiration of the authorization granted to residential property owners in high risk brush fire areas on Staten Island to cut and remove reeds from their property.
Title
Extends, from December 31, 2023 to December 31, 2024, the expiration of the authorization granted to residential property owners in high risk brush fire areas on Staten Island to cut and remove reeds from their property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-23 | Assembly | signed chap.299 |
2023-08-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.612 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4829 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.175 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.175 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04829 (Same As) 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6857