NY A06853 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To insure that an individual, who is a citizen of the United States, shall be informed of his/her right to participate in the voting process, once the individual has completed his/her sentence of incarceration and/or parole.
Title
Requires the department of correctional service to provide every person completing a sentence of imprisonment for a felony, with written notice of such person's eligibility to register to vote and to vote after such discharge from prison; requires the board of parole to provide every person discharged from parole or conditional discharge, with written notice of such person's eligibility to register to vote and to vote after such discharge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to correction | |
2009-05-27 | print number 6853a | |
2009-05-27 | amend and recommit to correction | |
2009-03-13 | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S3559-A (Same As) 2010-02-08 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING