NY A06830 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.117
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.117
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Ronald Martin to take the competitive exam for police officer and be placed on the eligible list for a position as village patrolman.
Title
Authorizes Ronald Martin to take the competitive exam for police officer and be placed on the eligible list for a position as village patrolman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.117 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.256 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3136A |
2012-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.49 |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.49 |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2011-04-18 | Assembly | print number 6830a |
2011-04-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2011-04-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03136 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6830A