NY A06829 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an occupancy tax in the village of Harrison.
Title
Imposes an occupancy tax in the village of Harrison.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.72 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.72 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | print number 6829a |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.343 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.343 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02059 (Same As) 2014-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 2059B