NY A06796 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - substituted by s5572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - substituted by s5572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the threshold for applicability of wage payment protections for certain persons employed in a bona fide executive, administrative, or professional capacity, from $900 to $1,300 per week.
Title
Increases the threshold for applicability of wage payment protections for certain persons employed in a bona fide executive, administrative, or professional capacity, from $900 to $1,300 per week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s5572 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.271 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.271 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05572 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.433