NY A06781 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires regulations promulgated for systematic and sustained efforts to find work for unemployment benefits to include a claimant's need to provide child care.
Title
Requires regulations promulgated for systematic and sustained efforts to find work for unemployment benefits to include a claimant's need to provide child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.474 |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.303 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04644 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR