NY A06772 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - substituted by s2802
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to workforce opportunity data transparency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to workforce opportunity data transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19Assemblysubstituted by s2802
2021-05-13Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.378
2021-05-11Assemblyreported
2021-03-30Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S02802 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback