NY A06703 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - print number 6703a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - print number 6703a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Marie Glarakis, a former Suffolk county police officer who is receiving a performance of duty disability retirement, to change the designated beneficiary of her retirement benefits and her retirement option to single life allowance (Option 0).
Title
Authorizes Marie Glarakis, a former Suffolk county police officer who is receiving a performance of duty disability retirement, to change the designated beneficiary of her retirement benefits and her retirement option to single life allowance (Option 0).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Assembly | print number 6703a |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-05-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06575 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - PRINT NUMBER 6575A