NY A06696 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s5885a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s5885a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows out of state health care professionals to perform services at the Ironman Lake Placid 2021.
Title
Allows out of state health care professionals to perform services at the Ironman Lake Placid 2021.
Sponsors
Asm. Matthew Simpson [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Jeff Gallahan [R] | Asm. John Salka [R] |
Asm. John Lemondes [R] | Asm. Joseph Angelino [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s5885a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.354 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.354 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 6696a |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05885 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.172