NY A06687 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - substituted by s6632
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - substituted by s6632
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Syracuse to establish a demonstration program imposing monetary liability on the owner of a vehicle for failure of an operator thereof to comply with posted maximum speed limits in a school speed zone.
Title
Authorizes the city of Syracuse to establish a demonstration program imposing monetary liability on the owner of a vehicle for failure of an operator thereof to comply with posted maximum speed limits in a school speed zone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s6632 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.531 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | print number 6687a |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06632 (Same As) 2023-09-28 - SIGNED CHAP.502