NY A06672 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation would save commuter colleges great time and expense in the administration of the current requirement.
Title
Exempts commuter colleges from the requirement of maintaining measles, mumps and rubella (MMR) and meningococcal meningitis records.
Sponsors
Asm. Joel Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-19 | print number 6672a | |
2010-04-19 | amend (t) and recommit to health | |
2010-01-06 | referred to health | |
2009-03-11 | referred to health |