NY A06658 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes emergency evacuation plan for individuals with disabilities; establishes $500 fine for failure to comply with such plan within one year of the effective date.
Title
Establishes emergency evacuation plan for individuals with disabilities; establishes $500 fine for failure to comply with such plan within one year of the effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.215 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.228 |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03490 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT