NY A06642 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.586
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.586
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance to allow distillers and brewers to file their taxes electronically.
Title
Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance to allow distillers and brewers to file their taxes electronically.
Sponsors
Asm. Patrick Burke [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Karen McMahon [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. D. Billy Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.586 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.374 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a6642 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.130 |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s578 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.374 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.374 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00578 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.586