NY A06641 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To require new construction and substantial reconstruction projects of public school buildings undertak- en by school districts and city school districts to comply with green building standards, as established by office of general services (OGS) with the consultation of the department of education (DOE) and the New York State energy research and development authority (NYSERDA).
Title
Establishes the state Green School Building Construction Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to education | |
2009-06-05 | reference changed to education | |
2009-05-28 | print number 6641a | |
2009-05-28 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations | |
2009-03-11 | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S4924-A (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS