NY A06629 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of an early learning investment commission; provides support for public and private investment in early learning for children up to the age of five.
Title
Relates to the creation of an early learning investment commission; provides support for public and private investment in early learning for children up to the age of five.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | tabled |
2015-10-26 | Senate | vetoed memo.208 |
2015-10-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4421 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.329 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S04421 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6629