NY A06624 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an employer who is a member of a recognized religious sect to file an application with the department of labor to be exempted from the provisions of the workers' compensation law with respect to employees who are members of the same recognized religious sect whose religious tenets or teachings oppose acceptance of any insurance benefits.
Title
Permits an employer who is a member of a recognized religious sect to file an application with the department of labor to be exempted from the provisions of the workers' compensation law with respect to employees who are members of the same recognized religious sect whose religious tenets or teachings oppose acceptance of any insurance benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | held for consideration in labor |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | print number 6624a |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2017-03-10 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S00847 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR