NY A06604 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s4982
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s4982
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Protects employee freedom of speech and conscience by prohibiting employers from coercing employees into attending or participating in meetings sponsored by the employer concerning the employer's views on political or religious matters.
Title
Protects employee freedom of speech and conscience by prohibiting employers from coercing employees into attending or participating in meetings sponsored by the employer concerning the employer's views on political or religious matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s4982 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.596 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.596 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04982 (Same As) 2023-09-06 - SIGNED CHAP.354