NY A06600 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - substituted by s4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - substituted by s4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates uniformed officers of the fire marshal's office of the town of Huntington as peace officers.
Title
Designates uniformed officers of the fire marshal's office of the town of Huntington as peace officers.
Sponsors
Asm. James Conte [R] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Assembly | substituted by s4209 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.570 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.570 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-03-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04209 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.46