NY A06544 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - approval memo.41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - approval memo.41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expungement of records in persons in need of supervision cases in family court.
Title
Relates to expungement of records in persons in need of supervision cases in family court.
Sponsors
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Monique Chandler-Waterman [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Latrice Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | Assembly | approval memo.41 |
2023-12-08 | Assembly | signed chap.691 |
2023-11-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1860 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7444 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.184 |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S07444 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6544