NY A06532 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - print number 6532a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - print number 6532a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that state employees designated managerial or confidential shall receive an increase in salary comparable to the percentage of the general salary increases provided to employees in the state's professional, scientific, and technical services bargaining unit.
Title
Provides that state employees designated managerial or confidential shall receive an increase in salary comparable to the percentage of the general salary increases provided to employees in the state's professional, scientific, and technical services bargaining unit.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Assembly | print number 6532a |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05727 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5727A